U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mold Wranglers, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.