U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-20005-
  • Case Name: HAWKEN HUDYMA and BAILEY HUDYMA
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Reopen]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case to Administer Assets]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Trustee's Motion to Reopen Chapter 7 Case to Administer Assets]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Case Closure (Chapter7)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtors in a Chapter 7 Case (Joint)]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.