U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Laverdure
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention Hearing - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.