U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Newton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2025
  • February 03, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
January, 2025
  • January 30, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • January 28, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 17, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.