U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-bk-90011-
  • Case Name: Sylvia Mikulski
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Financial Management Course Certificate]
January, 2025
  • January 26, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
  • January 24, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Deficiency Notice All Chapters]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.