U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10006-
  • Case Name: JACK CREEK LAND HOLDINGS LLP
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Continue Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Continue Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Continue Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Application/Motion to Employ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.