U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10010-
  • Case Name: KC Transport, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Shorten Time]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Shorten Time]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Shorten Time]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion for Sale of Property Under Section 363(f)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Objection/Response to Motion to Modify Stay (Hearing Required)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Application to Employ]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Application/Motion to Employ]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - BK]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.