U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ditonno et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 31, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.