U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-bk-10191-
  • Case Name: Dale L. Gordon, Jr and Kristina M. Gordon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Modify Chapter 13 Plan under §1329(d) - CARES Act]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Vacate]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Extend Time]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
February, 2025
  • February 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Generic Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.