U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cv-00165
  • Case Name: Webster v. Sheriff Peterson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Staying Case]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.