U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-bk-90031-
  • Case Name: REBEKAH ALICE DUBOIS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Continue, Notice of Intent to Amend Plan, Request]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion to Continue, Notice of Intent to Amend Plan, Request to Set New Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Continue Hearing, Notice of Intent to Amend Plan, Request to Set New Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion to Dismiss Case -Trustee]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Order on Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Motion Compelling Turnover of Documents to the U.S. Trustee/Trustee]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Pending Dismissal - Chapter 7 or 13 Deficiencies]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [Notice of Pending Dismissal - Chapters 7 or 13 Deficiencies]
  • March 01, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DRUMMOND, ROBERT G. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.