U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lapier
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 04, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 06, 2025: [Detention Hearing - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.