U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Severns
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Suppress ]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.