U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cr-00001-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Lott et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 30, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 18, 2025: [Remark - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.