U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wiberg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 11, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.