U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Leavitt Great West Insurance Services, LLC v. Theriault et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 17, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Reassignment - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 04, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.