U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bigman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.