U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quispe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 10, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • March 10, 2025: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.