U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crowder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.