U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Terkildsen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Suppress ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.