U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:25-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Starr
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.