U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buckmiller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.