U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:23-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poulson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Letter - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Competency Hearing - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Forensic Evaluation Report - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Pro Se Motion - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.