U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lundstrom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss ]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.