U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walking Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.