U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schultz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 03, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.