U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Myo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • April 10, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 24, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.