U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moorse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.