U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Yellowstone River Equipment, LLC v. No Credit CK, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notification of Assignment to USMJ - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.