U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00107-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Denny
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Letter - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.