U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Muth
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 13, 2025: [Expedite ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.