U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00108-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniely et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 26, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • March 26, 2025: [Revocation of Pretrial Release Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.