U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garfield
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Suppress ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.