U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roundstone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Warrant ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.