U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swank
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.