U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hoover
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 01, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.