U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Samek
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • May 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • March 26, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.