U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-20003-
  • Case Name: Heather Leigh Baughman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Discharging Debtor in a Chapter 7 Case (Individual)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Hearing Terminated - Text Only]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Overdue Installment Fee]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice for Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Second)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Overdue Installment Fee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.