U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Plainfeather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 31, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 24, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.