U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00148-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Sartor et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 20, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.