U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00175
  • Case Name: Holbrook Holdings, INC., v. Cohodes
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Reassignment - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.