U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00092-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Cochran, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Rule 5 Documents MT Deft - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.