U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blacksmith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 18, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 28, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.