U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00003-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andrews
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 03, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 03, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 03, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.