U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10024-
  • Case Name: Thomas Glenn Dunn and Carrie-Anne Dunn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Order Setting Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Claims]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: BRANDON, CHRISTY L [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.