U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.