U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cantrell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.