U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Rammel v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Mediation - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.