U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:08-cr-00141-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruddle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.