U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-mj-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mathis et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.